THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:37:15 PM
Alman, Benjamin Aaron
CPSO#:
65853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Thomas Jefferson University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 9788909
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN AARON ALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jul 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1997 |