THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:27:38 AM
Oza, Amit Manulal
CPSO#:
65839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
BRAS Drug Development Prog
Suite 700U, 7-925
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4450
Fax: 416-946-4467
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIT MANULAL OZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1994 |