THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:34:03 PM
Godfrey, Sean Edmund
CPSO#:
65777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
872 Dutton Rd
Peterborough ON K9H 7G1
Phone: 705 745 1313
Fax: 705 745 5494
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:20 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN EDMUND GODFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GODFREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1996 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: April 2, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Sean Edmund Godfrey was charged with the following offences:
1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault, between January 1, 2020 and March 31, 2020, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: April 2, 2024
Place of Charge: Oshawa, Ontario
Durham Regional Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 12, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On March 12, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Sean Edmund Godfrey:
1. Godfrey must attend at Police Station in person and fill out the change of address form within 24 hours of any change of residential address.
2. Godfrey must abstain from communicating or associating, directly or indirectly, with named persons, except through legal counsel and other legal proceedings.
3. Godfrey must remain 100 metres away from any place of residence, employment, education, worship or any other place where named persons are known to be, except while attending court for legal proceedings.
4. Godfrey must not possess any weapons as defined by the Criminal Code nor possess or apply for any authorization, licence, or registration certificate related thereto and surrender forthwith any such item in his possession to the Police.
5. Godfrey must abstain from possessing a firearm and surrender forthwith to Police any firearm in his possession and any authorization, licence, or registration certificate or other document enabling the acquisition or possession of a firearm.