THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:20:05 PM
Danial, Sarah Badar
CPSO#:
65770
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Danial-Iqbal, Sarah Badar (used until: 02 Feb 1997 )
Danial, Sarah Badar (used until: 27 Feb 1995 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5Z4
Phone: (905) 357-2360
Fax: (905) 357-4714
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. B. Danial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2009
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH BADAR DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1992 |