THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:59:00 PM
Takhar, Jatinder
CPSO#:
65759
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Jammu University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
Level F3 466
550 Wellington Road
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47193
Fax: (519) 452-4593
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JATINDER TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1997 |