THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:27:44 AM
Blichowski, Teresa Danuta
CPSO#:
65757
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Teresa D. Blichowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERESA DANUTA BLICHOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLICHOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1996 |