THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:12:08 PM
Polis, Ilona Cecylia
CPSO#:
65729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON K2P 1R9
Phone: (613) 565-3479
Fax: (613) 565-8763
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ILONA CECYLIA POLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 23 Apr 2001 to 11 May 2001
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 May 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2002 |