THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:41:01 AM
Levinson, Ari David
CPSO#:
65726
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Wynford Drive Suite 511
Toronto ON M3C 3S2
Phone: (416) 691-3111
Fax: (416) 691-9957
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARI DAVID LEVINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1996 |