THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:25:18 AM
Kamel, Mona Kamel
CPSO#:
65725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4532 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 3M2
Phone: (647) 991-9475
Fax: (905) 848-8183
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONA KAMEL KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1997 |