THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:27:55 AM
Mui, Jimmy Ka Yeung
CPSO#:
65719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Dundee, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JIMMY KA YEUNG MUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1997 |