THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:45:15 AM
Abramson, Sydney Leonard
CPSO#:
65717
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sydney Abramson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patientvu EMR
c/o Novx
9130 Leslie St # 203
Richmond Hill, ONT L4B 0B9
Date Received: 28 Jun 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Florida
USA - New York
USA - Oklahoma
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |