THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:02:31 AM
Yucel, Yeni Hasan
CPSO#:
65714
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Turkish
Education: Universite de Louis Pasteur, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine & Pathobiology
St Michael's Hospital
209 LKSKI Room 409
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77594
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YENI HASAN YUCEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUCEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1998 |