THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:24:13 PM
Garcia, Cesar Pantaleon
CPSO#:
65706
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 895-5199
Fax: (905) 895-4033
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CESAR PANTALEON GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 10 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1996 |