THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:11:04 PM
Hercig, Dragan
CPSO#:
65683
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2211-35 Bales Ave
North York ON M2N 7L7
Phone: 4169340098
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Croatia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGAN HERCIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1996 |