THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:55:09 AM
Elliott, Maria Esther
CPSO#:
65680
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Siena, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Esther Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2020 |