THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:08:51 PM
Gulka, Irene Billie
CPSO#:
65667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
London, Ontario
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3203
Fax: 519 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRENE BILLIE GULKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 1996 to 23 Feb 1996
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1996 |