THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:44:45 PM
Masri, Sam
CPSO#:
65653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Spanish
Education: University Central Del Este, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 972-9273
Fax: (647) 494-4686
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAM MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2002 |