THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:52:35 AM
Yamamura, Deborah Lynn Reiko
CPSO#:
65636
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Level 1, Room 1-90
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46111
Fax: (905) 577-8027
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN REIKO YAMAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMAMURA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1993 |