THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:19:35 PM
Dhanidina, Muhammad Karim
CPSO#:
65615
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Dhanidina, Mohammad Karim (used until: 09 May 1994 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3554
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD KARIM DHANIDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANIDINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Mar 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Mar 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1996 |