THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:59:51 PM
Swinamer, Stuart Alan
CPSO#:
65614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6-120
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 15109
Fax: (519) 679-6414
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STUART ALAN SWINAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWINAMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1992 to 13 Jul 1992
EL - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 1992 to 10 Aug 1992
EL - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Aug 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1993 |