THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:16:01 PM
Hostetler, Jason Lee
CPSO#:
65583
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
440 Boler Road
London ON N6K 4L2
Phone: (519) 472-1846
Fax: (519) 472-4453
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON LEE HOSTETLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSTETLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1993 |