THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:50:48 AM
Habot, Juda
CPSO#:
65575
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Yiddish
Education: University of Calgary, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Codsell Avenue,
Lower Level
North York ON M3H 3V6
Phone: (647) 699-9800
Fax: (647) 699-9808
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDA HABOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABOT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2002 |