THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:13:00 PM
Watson, Paul Andrew
CPSO#:
65563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-5452
Fax: (807) 622-5710
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:31 Oct 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |