THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 21:05:27 PM
Grossman, Daphna Laurel
CPSO#:
65531
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street 3S-375
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 3508
Fax: (416) 756-6024
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAPHNA LAUREL GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |