THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:04:25 PM
Eriksson, Enid Sindy
CPSO#:
65530
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Enid Eriksson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jul 2021 |