THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:47:06 PM
Morrison, Kristin Rebecca
CPSO#:
65528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kristin R. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTIN REBECCA MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 17 Nov 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2010 |