THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:10:03 PM
Grimes, David Andrew
CPSO#:
65508
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital -- Civic Campus
Division of Neurology - C2
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18162
Fax: 613-761-5360
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.A. Grimes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 29 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW GRIMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1993 |