THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:45:48 PM
Nyhus, Nadine Janice
CPSO#:
65494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
195 Abraham St
Cambridge ON N3H 1H4
Phone: (519)717-6716
Fax: (519) 653-7423
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Jul 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE JANICE NYHUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NYHUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |