THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:38:49 AM
Bristow, Robbie Glen
CPSO#:
65453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robbie Bristow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2018 |