THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:31:42 AM
Jaigobin, Cheryl Susheila
CPSO#:
65414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Krembil Neuroscience Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 5th Floor Room 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5960
Fax: (416) 603-5409
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHERYL SUSHEILA JAIGOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIGOBIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1993 |