THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:46:26 PM
Blaine, Kirsten Ann
CPSO#:
65406
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Van Staalduinen, Kirsten Ann (used until: 03 Jun 1993 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ANN BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1993 |