THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:39:29 AM
De Foa, James Lance
CPSO#:
65398
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 May 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 18, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James De Foa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 18, 2023:
College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. De Foa engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice, in his conduct and communication in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and in his cooperation with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. In the face of the investigations, Dr. De Foa has agreed to resign from the College effective May 18, 2023, and never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Lance De Foa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 21, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. De Foa engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. De Foa will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.
Dr. De Foa will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and prescribing.
Dr. De Foa’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.