THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:33:48 AM
Willms, Larry Albert
CPSO#:
65357
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-5160
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Koval and Willms Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 19 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARRY ALBERT WILLMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Nov 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1993 |