THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:27:33 PM
Noble, Jonathan Charles Stirling
CPSO#:
65332
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jonathan Noble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |