THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:16:09 PM
Caccia, Nicolette Camilla
CPSO#:
65323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1017 Wilson Ave. Suite 202
Toronto ON M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 438-2727
Fax: (416) 438-2713
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLETTE CAMILLA CACCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACCIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2018 |