THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:34:49 AM
Rao, Vivek
CPSO#:
65313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 457
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3562
Fax: (416) 340-3337
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIVEK RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |