THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:14:56 AM
Eisen, Andrea Frances
CPSO#:
65305
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T2-038
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Andrea Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA FRANCES EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |