THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:20:52 AM
Dushenski, David Gary
CPSO#:
65294
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3013
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GARY DUSHENSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSHENSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |