THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:39:07 PM
Le, Hoang Yen
CPSO#:
65290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pediatrics and Family Clinic
1218 King Street West
Toronto ON M6K 1G4
Phone: (416) 538-8833
Fax: (416) 538-7685
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOANG YEN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |