THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:11:14 AM
Granovsky, Shawna
CPSO#:
65289
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street, 2nd Floor NICU
Toronto, Ontario
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWNA GRANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANOVSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1993 |