THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:59:06 PM
Kao, John Te Shao
CPSO#:
65275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-110 Copper Creek Dr
Boxgrove Medical Arts Centre
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 471-5633
Fax: (905) 471-5634
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 19 Sep 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 26 Sep 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 26 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 26 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 19 Sep 2023
Summary:
On September 19, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Kao engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by providing medical care and treatment to Individual X, a family member/person close to him.
The Tribunal ordered that:
- Dr. Kao attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Kao’s certificate of registration for five (5) months commencing September 26, 2023;
- the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Kao’s certificate of registration;
- Dr. Kao pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 19, 2023.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty and Reprimand; 2023-09-19