THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:46:21 AM
McGee, Allison Jane
CPSO#:
65264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4900 Yonge St
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
North York ON M2N 6A4
Phone: 416-952-0562
Fax: 416-952-0569
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLISON JANE MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |