THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:31:20 PM
Talman, Marianne Ruth
CPSO#:
65195
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing Room 424
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. x46215
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIANNE RUTH TALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1993 |