THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:17:57 AM
Ellis, Susan Maureen Ollerhead
CPSO#:
65173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN MAUREEN OLLERHEAD ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1993 |