THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:52:23 AM
Toth, Peter
CPSO#:
65163
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2W1
Phone: 905 813 1100 Ext. 5698
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |