THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:50:34 PM
Paterson, Faith Hallward
CPSO#:
65146
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sub-200 Bay St
MCI Royal Bank Plaza
Toronto ON M5J 2J0
Phone: 416-368-6787
Fax: 416-368-7632
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Faith Paterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Afghanistan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAITH HALLWARD PATERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2008 |