THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:41:19 PM
Vahdat, Jamie Homayoun
CPSO#:
65139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vahdat, Homayoun (used until: 14 Feb 2008 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4-6800 Morrison St.
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6Z8
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMIE HOMAYOUN VAHDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHDAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1993 |