THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:01:13 AM
Simpson, Christopher Steven
CPSO#:
65136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEVEN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1993 |