THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:19:28 AM
Cusimano, Steven Lawrence
CPSO#:
65127
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
132 Parkdale Avenue South
Suite 204
Hamilton ON L8K 3P3
Phone: (905) 547-6331
Fax: (905) 547-5755
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN LAWRENCE CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |