THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:51:56 PM
Iannantuono, Biagio
CPSO#:
65121
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
03 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For requests for medical records please contact Dr. Rohit Gupta and Dr. Jessica Reid at the below address:
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge, ON P1L 2E4
Fax: (705) 646-1473
Dr. Reid phone: (705) 646-8957
Dr. Gupta phone: (705) 645-7749
Date Received: 29 Mar 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 25, 2022, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Biagio Iannantuono resigned his privileges as of March 21, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1993 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 08 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 02 Aug 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 03 Aug 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 02 Aug 2023
Summary:
On August 2, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Iannantuono engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in that:- he asked Ms. X, an ultrasound technician and a hospital colleague, to perform a scrotal ultrasound on him, circumventing the hospital’s usual practices with respect to imaging requisitions;
- he repeatedly exposed his penis to Ms. X during the ultrasound, contrary to her instructions with respect to gowning/draping; and
- he repeatedly caused Ms. X’s hand to make contact with his penis.
The Tribunal ordered that:
- Dr. Iannantuono attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Iannantuono’s certificate of registration for 18 months commencing August 3, 2023;
- the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Iannantuono’s certificate of registration;
- Dr. Iannantuono pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by September 4, 2023.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-08-02
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 2009
Summary:
On December 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Iannantuono committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Iannantuono, a general surgeon, had his office nurse do postoperative examinations on patients following surgery, including hernia repair patients. Ms. X was employed as a nurse in Dr. Iannantuono's office. In mid 2008, Dr. Iannantuono spoke to Ms. X about her scrotal examinations and offered to assist her in learning proper examination techniques by doing a scrotal examination on him. Ms. X rejected the idea and was clearly uncomfortable with it. Dr. Iannantuono told Ms. X that no one needed to know about the incident. Previous to this incident, another nurse employed by Dr. Iannantuono had performed a practice scrotal examination on him.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Iannantuono's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month commencing on the date of this Order.
2. Dr. Iannantuono pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
3. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 8, 2009